Senate | 03/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 505 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 447 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 306 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 306 | |
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |