House | 05/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1586 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 225 | |
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 225 | |
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |