Senate | 05/07/2025 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1800 | |
Senate | 05/06/2025 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1764 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2763 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Record vote | RV#1368 | Journal Page: 2762 |
House | 05/05/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2762 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Record vote RV#1368 | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2743 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1359 | Journal Page: 2744 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2742 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2615 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 03/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 768 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 665 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 637 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 309 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 309 | |
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |