House | 05/13/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 2496 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2496 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1552 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1263 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 312 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 312 | |
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |