House
|
05/05/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2265
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1572
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1501
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1367
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|