House | 05/06/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2758 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 2024 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2029 | |
House | 04/23/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1386 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1385 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 370 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 370 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |