House
|
05/05/2025
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1686
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#948
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote RV#948
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2280
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2219
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#887
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1888
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1905
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 908
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 848
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 763
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 370
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 370
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|