House | 05/05/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1576 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1580 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1062 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Statement(s) submitted | Journal Page: 951 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 951 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 951 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 949 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 808 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 371 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 371 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |