Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 10, 2025
Bill February 10, 2025
Analysis February 10, 2025

House Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2025
Analysis April 28, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2025
Fiscal Note March 27, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 17, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025
Fiscal Note March 17, 2025
Bill March 17, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025
Bill March 17, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025
Analysis March 11, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2025
Fiscal Note March 17, 2025
Fiscal Note March 16, 2025