Senate | 04/23/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1438 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 590 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 375 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 375 | |
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |