1 | 1 | | By: Middleton, et al. S.B. No. 1241 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2025; February 28, 2025, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 22, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 1; April 22, 2025, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1241 By: Paxton |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
14 | 14 | | AN ACT |
---|
15 | 15 | | relating to college entrance examinations considered for admission |
---|
16 | 16 | | to certain public institutions of higher education and a study by |
---|
17 | 17 | | the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board regarding those |
---|
18 | 18 | | examinations. |
---|
19 | 19 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
20 | 20 | | SECTION 1. Section 51.803(a), Education Code, is amended to |
---|
21 | 21 | | read as follows: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (a) Subject to Subsection (a-1), each general academic |
---|
23 | 23 | | teaching institution shall admit an applicant for admission to the |
---|
24 | 24 | | institution as an undergraduate student if the applicant graduated |
---|
25 | 25 | | with a grade point average in the top 10 percent of the student's |
---|
26 | 26 | | high school graduating class in one of the two school years |
---|
27 | 27 | | preceding the academic year for which the applicant is applying for |
---|
28 | 28 | | admission and: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (1) the applicant: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (A) graduated from a public or private high |
---|
31 | 31 | | school in this state accredited by a generally recognized |
---|
32 | 32 | | accrediting organization or from a high school operated by the |
---|
33 | 33 | | United States Department of Defense; or |
---|
34 | 34 | | (B) completed a nontraditional secondary |
---|
35 | 35 | | education as defined by Section 51.9241; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2) the applicant: |
---|
37 | 37 | | (A) successfully completed: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (i) at a public high school, the curriculum |
---|
39 | 39 | | requirements established under Section 28.025 for the |
---|
40 | 40 | | distinguished level of achievement under the foundation high school |
---|
41 | 41 | | program; or |
---|
42 | 42 | | (ii) at a high school to which Section |
---|
43 | 43 | | 28.025 does not apply, a curriculum that is equivalent in content |
---|
44 | 44 | | and rigor to the distinguished level of achievement under the |
---|
45 | 45 | | foundation high school program; or |
---|
46 | 46 | | (B) achieved a score set by the Texas Higher |
---|
47 | 47 | | Education Coordinating Board on a college entrance examination |
---|
48 | 48 | | designated by coordinating board rule [satisfied ACT's College |
---|
49 | 49 | | Readiness Benchmarks on the ACT assessment applicable to the |
---|
50 | 50 | | applicant or earned on the SAT assessment a score of at least 1,500 |
---|
51 | 51 | | out of 2,400 or the equivalent]; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | (3) if the applicant graduated from a high school |
---|
53 | 53 | | operated by the United States Department of Defense, the applicant |
---|
54 | 54 | | is a Texas resident under Section 54.052 or is entitled to pay |
---|
55 | 55 | | tuition fees at the rate provided for Texas residents under Section |
---|
56 | 56 | | 54.241(d) for the term or semester to which admitted. |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 2. Section 51.805(a), Education Code, is amended to |
---|
58 | 58 | | read as follows: |
---|
59 | 59 | | (a) A graduating student who does not qualify for admission |
---|
60 | 60 | | under Section 51.803 or 51.804 may apply to any general academic |
---|
61 | 61 | | teaching institution if the student: |
---|
62 | 62 | | (1) successfully completed: |
---|
63 | 63 | | (A) at a public high school, the curriculum |
---|
64 | 64 | | requirements established under Section 28.025 for the foundation |
---|
65 | 65 | | high school program; or |
---|
66 | 66 | | (B) at a high school to which Section 28.025 does |
---|
67 | 67 | | not apply, a curriculum that is equivalent in content and rigor to |
---|
68 | 68 | | the foundation high school program; or |
---|
69 | 69 | | (2) achieved a score set by the Texas Higher Education |
---|
70 | 70 | | Coordinating Board on a college entrance examination designated by |
---|
71 | 71 | | coordinating board rule [satisfied ACT's College Readiness |
---|
72 | 72 | | Benchmarks on the ACT assessment applicable to the applicant or |
---|
73 | 73 | | earned on the SAT assessment a score of at least 1,500 out of 2,400 |
---|
74 | 74 | | or the equivalent]. |
---|
75 | 75 | | SECTION 3. Subchapter U, Chapter 51, Education Code, is |
---|
76 | 76 | | amended by adding Section 51.8031 to read as follows: |
---|
77 | 77 | | Sec. 51.8031. STUDY ON COLLEGE ENTRANCE EXAMINATION SCORES. |
---|
78 | 78 | | (a) In this section, "coordinating board" means the Texas Higher |
---|
79 | 79 | | Education Coordinating Board. |
---|
80 | 80 | | (b) The coordinating board, in cooperation with |
---|
81 | 81 | | institutions of higher education, shall conduct a study on college |
---|
82 | 82 | | entrance examinations to determine which examinations to |
---|
83 | 83 | | designate, and the score to set for each examination, under |
---|
84 | 84 | | Sections 51.803(a)(2)(B) and 51.805(a)(2). |
---|
85 | 85 | | (c) The study must: |
---|
86 | 86 | | (1) identify each college entrance examination with |
---|
87 | 87 | | sufficient rigor and reliability to be designated for purposes of |
---|
88 | 88 | | Sections 51.803(a)(2)(B) and 51.805(a)(2); and |
---|
89 | 89 | | (2) determine the score for each examination |
---|
90 | 90 | | identified under Subdivision (1) that demonstrates adequate |
---|
91 | 91 | | performance for purposes of Sections 51.803(a)(2)(B) and |
---|
92 | 92 | | 51.805(a)(2). |
---|
93 | 93 | | (d) Not later than August 1, 2026, the coordinating board |
---|
94 | 94 | | shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker |
---|
95 | 95 | | of the house of representatives, and the chair of each standing |
---|
96 | 96 | | legislative committee with primary jurisdiction over higher |
---|
97 | 97 | | education a report on the results of the study and any |
---|
98 | 98 | | recommendations for legislative or other action. |
---|
99 | 99 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2027. |
---|
100 | 100 | | SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act to Sections |
---|
101 | 101 | | 51.803(a) and 51.805(a), Education Code, apply beginning with |
---|
102 | 102 | | admissions to a general academic teaching institution for the 2026 |
---|
103 | 103 | | fall semester. Admissions to a general academic teaching |
---|
104 | 104 | | institution for a term or semester before the 2026 fall semester are |
---|
105 | 105 | | governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date |
---|
106 | 106 | | of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that |
---|
107 | 107 | | purpose. |
---|
108 | 108 | | SECTION 5. In designating college entrance examinations and |
---|
109 | 109 | | setting a score for those examinations for purposes of Sections |
---|
110 | 110 | | 51.803(a)(2)(B) and 51.805(a)(2), Education Code, as amended by |
---|
111 | 111 | | this Act, for the 2026-2027 academic year, the Texas Higher |
---|
112 | 112 | | Education Coordinating Board shall designate each college entrance |
---|
113 | 113 | | examination and set the score for the examination that was used |
---|
114 | 114 | | under those provisions as those provisions existed immediately |
---|
115 | 115 | | before the effective date of this Act. |
---|
116 | 116 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
117 | 117 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
118 | 118 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
119 | 119 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
120 | 120 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|
121 | 121 | | * * * * * |
---|