Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB125 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/24/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hall, Paxton S.B. No. 125
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 24, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2;
 March 24, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 125 By:  Perry




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to autologous and direct blood donations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 162, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 162.021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 162.021.  AUTOLOGOUS OR DIRECT BLOOD DONATION.  A blood
 bank that facilitates autologous or direct blood donations shall
 comply with a physician's order prescribing for an individual an
 autologous or direct blood donation.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 241, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 241.013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 241.013.  AUTOLOGOUS AND DIRECT BLOOD DONATIONS. A
 hospital licensed under this chapter that facilitates blood
 donations shall allow an individual on whom a medical procedure is
 to be performed to provide an autologous or direct blood donation a
 physician orders for the procedure.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *