House
|
04/23/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1740
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 880
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 809
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 800
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 377
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 377
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|