Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1266 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Alvarado, Hinojosa of Hidalgo S.B. No. 1266
2- (In the Senate - Filed February 13, 2025; February 28, 2025,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
4- Services; April 28, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
5- Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6- April 28, 2025, sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1266 By: Perry
1+89R4745 CMO-F
2+ By: Alvarado S.B. No. 1266
93
104
115
126
137 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
148 AN ACT
159 relating to Medicaid provider enrollment and credentialing
1610 processes.
1711 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
18- SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 532, Government Code, is
19- amended by adding Sections 532.01511 and 532.01512 to read as
20- follows:
12+ SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 532, Government Code, as
13+ effective April 1, 2025, is amended by adding Sections 532.01511
14+ and 532.01512 to read as follows:
2115 Sec. 532.01511. PROVIDER ENROLLMENT AND CREDENTIALING
2216 PROCESSES: PROVIDER SUPPORT; COMPLAINTS. (a) The commission shall
23- ensure that providers have access to a support team for the Internet
24- portal established under Section 532.0151 that:
17+ ensure that providers have access to a dedicated support team for
18+ the Internet portal established under Section 532.0151 that:
2519 (1) assists current and prospective Medicaid
2620 providers in completing the Medicaid provider enrollment and
2721 credentialing processes; and
2822 (2) reduces the administrative burdens associated
2923 with those processes.
3024 (b) The commission shall:
3125 (1) annually evaluate the performance of the support
3226 team described by Subsection (a), including the timeliness of
3327 assistance the support team provides; and
3428 (2) not later than September 1 of each year, post on
3529 the commission's Internet website a report summarizing the results
3630 of the evaluation conducted under Subdivision (1).
3731 (c) For purposes of improving the commission's Medicaid
3832 provider enrollment and credentialing processes, the commission
3933 shall develop a procedure by which a provider may electronically
4034 submit complaints and feedback about those processes and the
4135 support provided by the support team described by Subsection (a).
4236 Information about the procedure must:
4337 (1) be prominently posted on the commission's or the
4438 commission's designee's Internet website in the same location that
4539 instructions and resources for using the Internet portal
4640 established under Section 532.0151 are posted; and
4741 (2) allow a provider to submit a complaint or provide
4842 feedback through an electronic form from that location.
4943 Sec. 532.01512. NOTICE OF PROVIDER DISENROLLMENT. Before
50- the commission may disenroll a Medicaid provider for failing to
51- complete the enrollment revalidation process, the commission must:
44+ the commission may disenroll a Medicaid provider during the
45+ provider's enrollment revalidation period, the commission must:
5246 (1) not later than 30 days before the date of
5347 disenrollment provide electronically and by mail to the provider
5448 written notice of the commission's disenrollment determination;
5549 and
5650 (2) allow the provider to address any deficiencies in
5751 the provider's application for revalidation of enrollment before
5852 the date the provider will be disenrolled.
5953 SECTION 2. Notwithstanding Section 532.01511, Government
6054 Code, as added by this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission
6155 shall conduct the initial evaluation and post the report
6256 summarizing the results of the evaluation as required by that
6357 section not later than September 1, 2026.
6458 SECTION 3. As soon as possible after the effective date of
6559 this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission shall:
6660 (1) ensure the Internet portal support team required
6761 by Section 532.01511(a), Government Code, as added by this Act, is
6862 established; and
6963 (2) adopt rules necessary to implement the changes in
7064 law made by this Act.
7165 SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act
7266 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
7367 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
7468 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
7569 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
7670 waiver or authorization is granted.
7771 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
78- * * * * *