Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1683 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1608 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 380 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 380 | |
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |