House | 05/07/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Public hearing continued on . . . | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1085 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Statement(s) submitted | Journal Page: 626 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 626 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 612 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 613 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 612 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Paxton | Journal Page: 611 |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 611 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 414 | |
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 243 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 243 | |
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |