House | 05/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1650 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1650 | |
House | 04/10/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1028 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1028 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1028 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1028 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1027 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 382 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 382 | |
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 329 | |
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |