Senate | 04/02/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 506 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |