Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1321 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Hagenbuch, Blanco S.B. No. 1321
2-
3-
1+By: Hagenbuch S.B. No. 1321
2+ (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2025; February 28, 2025,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
4+ March 31, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7,
5+ Nays 0; March 31, 2025, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
47
58
69 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
710 AN ACT
811 relating to compensation and leave for certain peace officers.
912 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1013 SECTION 1. Section 659.301(5), Government Code, is amended
1114 to read as follows:
1215 (5) "State employee" means an individual who:
1316 (A) is a commissioned law enforcement officer of
1417 the Department of Public Safety, the Texas Facilities Commission,
1518 the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission, the Texas Department of
1619 Criminal Justice, the attorney general, the Texas Commission on Law
1720 Enforcement, or the insurance fraud unit of the Texas Department of
1821 Insurance;
1922 (B) is a commissioned security officer of the
2023 comptroller;
2124 (C) is a law enforcement officer commissioned by
2225 the Parks and Wildlife Commission;
2326 (D) is a commissioned peace officer of an
2427 institution of higher education;
2528 (E) is an employee or official of the Board of
2629 Pardons and Paroles or the parole division of the Texas Department
2730 of Criminal Justice if the employee or official has routine direct
2831 contact with inmates of any penal or correctional institution or
2932 with administratively released prisoners subject to the board's
3033 jurisdiction;
3134 (F) has been certified to the Employees
3235 Retirement System of Texas under Section 815.505 as having begun
3336 employment as a law enforcement officer or custodial officer,
3437 unless the individual has been certified to the system as having
3538 ceased employment as a law enforcement officer or custodial
3639 officer;
3740 (G) before May 29, 1987, received hazardous duty
3841 pay based on the terms of any state law if the individual holds a
3942 position designated under that law as eligible for the pay; or
4043 (H) is a security officer employed by the Texas
4144 Military Department.
4245 SECTION 2. Section 661.918(a), Government Code, is amended
4346 to read as follows:
4447 (a) This section applies to a peace officer under Article
4548 2A.001, Code of Criminal Procedure, who is commissioned as a law
4649 enforcement officer or agent, including a ranger, by:
4750 (1) the Public Safety Commission and the director of
4851 the Department of Public Safety;
4952 (2) the Parks and Wildlife Commission;
5053 (3) the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission;
5154 (4) the attorney general; [or]
5255 (5) the insurance fraud unit of the Texas Department
5356 of Insurance; [or]
5457 (6) the comptroller; or
5558 (7) the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement.
5659 SECTION 3. Section 1701.160, Occupations Code, is amended
5760 to read as follows:
5861 Sec. 1701.160. AUTHORITY TO COMMISSION INVESTIGATORS AS
5962 PEACE OFFICERS. (a) The commission may commission certified peace
6063 officers as investigators employed by the commission for the
6164 limited purpose of assisting the commission in administering this
6265 chapter.
6366 (b) The commission shall ensure a peace officer
6467 commissioned under Subsection (a) is compensated according to
6568 Schedule C of the position classification salary schedule
6669 prescribed by the General Appropriations Act.
6770 SECTION 4. (a) The classification officer in the office of
6871 the state auditor shall classify the position of commissioned peace
6972 officer employed by the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement as a
7073 Schedule C position under the position classification plan
7174 maintained under Chapter 654, Government Code.
7275 (b) The change made by the classification officer as
7376 required by this section applies beginning with the state fiscal
7477 biennium beginning September 1, 2025.
7578 (c) This section expires September 1, 2027.
7679 SECTION 5. Section 661.918(a), Government Code, as amended
7780 by this Act, applies only to an injury that occurs on or after the
7881 effective date of this Act.
7982 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
83+ * * * * *