Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1329 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/18/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R10708 CJD-D
 By: King S.B. No. 1329




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to school district police department accreditation,
 including a grant program to assist departments in becoming
 accredited.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.0303 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0303.  SCHOOL DISTRICT POLICE DEPARTMENT
 ACCREDITATION GRANT PROGRAM. (a) The comptroller shall establish
 and administer a grant program to provide financial assistance to a
 school district police department in this state for purposes of
 becoming accredited as required by the rules adopted under Section
 1701.171, Occupations Code.
 (b)  To be eligible to receive a grant under this section, a
 school district police department must have executed a contract
 with an accrediting entity described by Section 1701.171(a),
 Occupations Code, and complete an initial assessment by the
 accrediting entity.
 (c)  Based on the results of the initial assessment completed
 under Subsection (b), a school district police department may
 request grant funds for reimbursement of an accreditation fee,
 staff overtime, or temporary staffing necessary to become
 accredited.
 (d)  Grant money provided under this section may only be used
 by a school district police department for the purposes of becoming
 accredited. A school district police department may not receive
 more than one grant under this section.
 (e)  The amount of a grant awarded under this section may not
 exceed $30,000.
 (f)  The comptroller shall establish:
 (1)  eligibility criteria for grant applicants;
 (2)  grant application procedures;
 (3)  guidelines relating to grant amounts;
 (4)  procedures for evaluating grant applications;
 (5)  procedures for monitoring the use of a grant
 awarded under the program and ensuring compliance with any
 conditions of a grant; and
 (6)  procedures for revoking a grant awarded under the
 program if the school district police department is not accredited
 within the period specified by the rules adopted under Section
 1701.171, Occupations Code.
 (g)  Not later than December 1 of each year, the comptroller
 shall submit to the Legislative Budget Board a report that provides
 the following information for the preceding state fiscal year:
 (1)  the name of each school district police department
 that applied for a grant under this section; and
 (2)  the amount of money distributed to each school
 district police department that received a grant under this
 section.
 (h)  The comptroller may use any revenue available for
 purposes of this section.
 (i)  Notwithstanding any other law or rule, beginning
 September 1, 2031, a school district police department must be
 accredited as provided by the rules adopted under Section 1701.171,
 Occupations Code, to be eligible to receive any grant supporting
 law enforcement operations or equipment acquisition administered
 by the comptroller other than a grant under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.171 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.171.  SCHOOL DISTRICT POLICE DEPARTMENT
 ACCREDITATION. (a) The commission shall adopt rules requiring
 each school district police department to become accredited and
 maintain accreditation:
 (1)  through the Texas Police Chiefs Association Law
 Enforcement Agency Best Practices Accreditation Program;
 (2)  by the Commission on Accreditation for Law
 Enforcement Agencies, Inc.; or
 (3)  by an association or organization designated by
 the commission as provided by Subsection (d).
 (b)  The rules adopted under Subsection (a) must require a
 school district police department that is not already accredited
 to:
 (1)  execute a contract with an approved accrediting
 entity not later than September 1, 2029; and
 (2)  become accredited not later than September 1,
 2031.
 (c)  The commission shall implement a program to assist
 school district police departments in becoming accredited as
 required by the rules adopted under Subsection (a).
 (d)  The commission shall periodically review associations
 and organizations that establish standards of practice for school
 district police departments and that offer accreditation to
 departments that meet those standards. On a majority vote of the
 commission that accreditation of school district police
 departments in this state by an association or organization would
 benefit public safety, the commission may designate the association
 or organization as an accrediting entity for purposes of Subsection
 (a)(3).
 (e)  A school district police department shall annually
 report the department's accreditation status, including the
 applicable accrediting entity described by Subsection (a), to the
 commission.
 (f)  The commission shall post on the commission's Internet
 website a list of all school district police departments that are
 currently accredited by, or under contract with, an accrediting
 entity described by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Not later than December 1, 2025, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall adopt the rules required by
 Section 1701.171, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2026, the comptroller shall
 establish the grant program required by Section 403.0303,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.