Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2729
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1346
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2729
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2728
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2540
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1178
|
Journal Page: 2540
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2540
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Record vote RV#1178
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3527
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2463
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1087
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 385
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 385
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|