Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1345 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/18/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R8694 AND-D
 By: Johnson S.B. No. 1345




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a public school transportation
 task force.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 34, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Section 34.016 to read as follows:
 Sec. 34.016.  PUBLIC SCHOOL TRANSPORTATION TASK FORCE. (a)
 In this section, "task force" means the public school
 transportation task force established under this section.
 (b)  The public school transportation task force is
 established to study and make recommendations relating to
 modernizing public school transportation in this state.
 (c)  The task force is composed of 20 members as follows:
 (1)  one member appointed by the governor;
 (2)  one member appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  one member appointed by the speaker of the house of
 representatives; and
 (4)  17 members appointed by the commissioner as
 follows:
 (A)  three parents of students enrolled in a
 school district who use the district's school transportation
 system, or would use that transportation system if it were
 available, at least one of whom must be a parent of a student
 enrolled at a campus that receives supplemental funding under Part
 A, Title 1, Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 (20
 U.S.C. Section 6311 et seq.) and:
 (i)  one of whom resides in a rural school
 district;
 (ii)  one of whom resides in a suburban
 school district; and
 (iii)  one of whom resides in an urban school
 district;
 (B)  three school district transportation
 directors, one of whom is from a rural school district, one of whom
 is from a suburban school district, and one of whom is from an urban
 school district;
 (C)  two directors of a school district's special
 education program under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, at least one of
 whom is from a rural school district;
 (D)  two members who represent open-enrollment
 charter schools, one of whom is from a school that offers a school
 transportation system and one of whom is from a school that does not
 offer a school transportation system;
 (E)  one member who represents a private
 prekindergarten provider that partners with a school district under
 Section 29.153(g);
 (F)  one member from an association that
 represents school bus drivers or school transportation staff;
 (G)  one member who represents an off-campus
 after-school program;
 (H)  two members who represent public
 transportation providers; and
 (I)  two members who are chief financial officers
 of a school district, one of whom is from a rural district and one of
 whom is from an urban district.
 (d)  The task force shall hold its first meeting not later
 than October 1, 2025, and shall elect a presiding officer from among
 its membership.  After the initial meeting, the task force shall
 meet at the times and places that the presiding officer determines
 appropriate.
 (e)  Members of the task force serve without compensation but
 are entitled to reimbursement for actual and necessary expenses
 incurred in performing official duties under this section.
 (f)  The agency shall provide information, assistance, and
 administrative support to the task force. To the extent feasible,
 the agency, in cooperation with school districts and
 open-enrollment charter schools, shall provide the task force with
 information relating to:
 (1)  criteria used by districts and schools to
 determine student eligibility for school-provided transportation
 and whether the criteria create barriers for a student to attend the
 student's school of choice;
 (2)  school transportation system utilization patterns
 and operations, including:
 (A)  the number of students eligible for
 school-provided transportation who use the school transportation
 system;
 (B)  whether routes are at capacity; and
 (C)  methodologies used by districts and schools
 to identify utilization patterns and adjust transportation
 operations accordingly;
 (3)  school transportation system staffing, including:
 (A)  the number of drivers required to cover
 routes;
 (B)  driver pay rates and hours of operation;
 (C)  driver vacancies; and
 (D)  contracts with public transportation
 providers or third-party transportation providers to satisfy
 school transportation needs;
 (4)  school transportation system fleet
 diversification, including:
 (A)  the types of vehicles used to satisfy school
 transportation needs;
 (B)  the associated costs of vehicles described by
 Paragraph (A), including purchasing, fuel, and maintenance costs;
 (C)  resale or salvage values of vehicles
 described by Paragraph (A); and
 (D)  the costs of a potential transition to
 electric vehicles; and
 (5)  discrepancies between the number of students
 eligible for school-provided transportation and the number of
 students who use that transportation and the causes of the
 discrepancies.
 (g)  The task force shall study:
 (1)  transportation challenges that create barriers
 for a student to attend the school district or open-enrollment
 charter school of the student's choice;
 (2)  improvements to the method of providing funding
 for school transportation systems under Section 48.151;
 (3)  existing and potential funding sources for school
 transportation systems;
 (4)  potential partnerships among school districts,
 open-enrollment charter schools, public and private transportation
 providers, and local nonprofit organizations to meet school
 transportation needs and create cost efficiencies while
 maintaining safety standards;
 (5)  career pathways in school transportation and
 logistics; and
 (6)  competitive salaries and benefits packages
 necessary to recruit and retain school transportation drivers.
 (h)  Not later than December 1, 2026, the task force shall
 submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and each legislative committee with
 primary jurisdiction over primary and secondary education a report
 on the task force's findings and any recommendations for
 legislative or other action.
 (i)  The task force is abolished and this section expires
 September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.