Senate
|
05/12/2025
|
House passage reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3431
|
House
|
05/09/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1889
|
|
House
|
05/09/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
House
|
05/09/2025
|
Record vote RV#1889
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3398
|
House
|
05/08/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1868
|
Journal Page: 3398
|
House
|
05/08/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2025
|
Record vote RV#1868
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3397
|
House
|
05/08/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 133
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3277
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2034
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1862
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 1449
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 424
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 424
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|