House
|
05/07/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1573
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2756
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency
|
|
Journal Page: 1641
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1650
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 763
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 425
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 425
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|