Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1365 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Nichols S.B. No. 1365
2-
3-
2+ (In the Senate - Filed February 18, 2025; March 6, 2025,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
4+ April 2, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8,
5+ Nays 0; April 2, 2025, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
47
58
69 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
710 AN ACT
811 relating to vehicle registration, license plates, and inspection
912 reports.
1013 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1114 SECTION 1. Section 2001.223, Government Code, as effective
1215 April 1, 2025, is amended to read as follows:
1316 Sec. 2001.223. EXCEPTIONS FROM DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, COURT
1417 ENFORCEMENT, AND CONTESTED CASE PROVISIONS. Section 2001.038 and
1518 Subchapters C through H do not apply to:
1619 (1) except as provided by Subchapter D, Chapter 545,
1720 the granting, payment, denial, or withdrawal of financial or
1821 medical assistance or benefits under service programs that were
1922 operated by the former Texas Department of Human Services before
2023 September 1, 2003, and are operated on and after that date by the
2124 Health and Human Services Commission or a health and human services
2225 agency, as defined by Section 521.0001;
2326 (2) action by the Banking Commissioner or the Finance
2427 Commission of Texas regarding the issuance of a state bank or state
2528 trust company charter for a bank or trust company to assume the
2629 assets and liabilities of a financial institution that the
2730 commissioner considers to be in hazardous condition as defined by
2831 Section 31.002(a) or 181.002(a), Finance Code, as applicable;
2932 (3) a hearing or interview conducted by the Board of
3033 Pardons and Paroles or the Texas Department of Criminal Justice
3134 relating to the grant, rescission, or revocation of parole or other
3235 form of administrative release; [or]
3336 (4) the suspension, revocation, or termination of the
3437 certification of a breath analysis operator or technical supervisor
3538 under the rules of the Department of Public Safety; or
3639 (5) the refusal to issue or renew a motor vehicle
3740 registration or the cancellation, suspension, or revocation of a
3841 motor vehicle registration under Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
3942 or rules adopted by the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles under
4043 that chapter.
4144 SECTION 2. Section 502.044, Transportation Code, is amended
4245 by adding Subsection (a-1) and amending Subsection (e) to read as
4346 follows:
4447 (a-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the department shall
4548 designate a vehicle registration period of 24 consecutive months to
4649 begin on the first day of a calendar month and end on the last day of
4750 the 24th calendar month for a passenger car or light truck that:
4851 (1) is sold in this state or purchased by a commercial
4952 fleet buyer described by Section 501.0234(b)(4) for use in this
5053 state;
5154 (2) has not been previously registered in this or
5255 another state; and
5356 (3) on the date of sale, is of the current or preceding
5457 model year.
5558 (e) The department shall use the date of sale of the vehicle
5659 in designating the registration period [year] for a vehicle for
5760 which registration is applied for under Section 501.0234.
5861 SECTION 3. Section 502.048, Transportation Code, is amended
5962 to read as follows:
6063 Sec. 502.048. REFUSAL TO REGISTER UNSAFE VEHICLE. (a)
6164 Subject to Subsection (b), the [The] department may refuse to
6265 register a motor vehicle and may cancel, suspend, or revoke a
6366 registration if the department determines that a motor vehicle is
6467 unsafe, improperly equipped, or otherwise unfit to be operated on a
6568 public highway.
6669 (b) The department may take action under Subsection (a):
6770 (1) only after providing to the owner of the motor
6871 vehicle for which the registration will be refused, canceled,
6972 suspended, or revoked notice of the proposed action and an
7073 opportunity to respond; and
7174 (2) without a hearing.
7275 SECTION 4. Section 502.360(b), Transportation Code, is
7376 amended to read as follows:
7477 (b) In addition to other fees authorized under this chapter,
7578 at the time of application for registration or renewal of
7679 registration of an electric vehicle, the applicant shall pay an
7780 additional fee of[:
7881 [(1) $400, for the registration of a new vehicle to
7982 which Section 548.102 applies; or
8083 [(2)] $200[,] for each 12 months of [the] registration
8184 [or renewal of registration of a vehicle to which Section 548.101
8285 applies].
8386 SECTION 5. Section 503.008(a), Transportation Code, as
8487 effective July 1, 2025, is amended to read as follows:
8588 (a) The fee for:
8689 (1) a dealer's license plate issued under Section
8790 503.061 is $20 a year; and
8891 (2) a dealer's temporary license plate issued under
8992 Section 503.062 is $10 for an original license plate and $0 for the
9093 renewal of the same license plate.
9194 SECTION 6. Section 503.0633(f), Transportation Code, as
9295 effective July 1, 2025, is amended to read as follows:
9396 (f) If the department determines that a dealer is
9497 fraudulently obtaining license plates or sets of license plates,
9598 [or] fraudulently using the database of dealer-issued license
9699 plates, or obtaining or using vehicle inspection reports described
97100 by Section 548.603(a)(1), the department may, after giving notice
98101 electronically and by certified mail to the dealer, deny access to
99102 the database of dealer-issued license plates to the dealer. A
100103 dealer denied access to the database of dealer-issued license
101104 plates under this subsection may request a hearing on the denial as
102105 provided by Subchapter O, Chapter 2301, Occupations Code.
103106 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
107+ * * * * *