House | 05/05/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 858 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 858 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 883 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 846 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 638 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 427 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 427 | |
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |