House
|
05/05/2025
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1637
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1642
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1554
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1368
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1358
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to Education K-16
|
|
Journal Page: 429
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 429
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|