E | 05/01/2025 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1709 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2125 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#801 | Journal Page: 2119 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2119 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2120 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#801 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2024 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#703 | Journal Page: 2020 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2020 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2290 | Journal Page: 2020 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2031 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1650 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1642 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1555 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |