Senate | 04/30/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Recommitted to committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1502 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1306 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 429 | |
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |