Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1436 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/31/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 1436
 (In the Senate - Filed February 19, 2025; March 6, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 31, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to accepting an early voting ballot voted by mail;
 creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 87, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 87.0412 to read as follows:
 Sec. 87.0412.  SUSPENSION OF ACCEPTING VOTER REQUIREMENTS
 PROHIBITED. (a)  A county clerk, elections administrator, early
 voting clerk, or early voting ballot board may not suspend the
 requirements under Section 87.041(b).
 (b)  A county clerk, elections administrator, or early
 voting clerk who violates this section commits an offense. An
 offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.  For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *