Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1455 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2025
Analysis February 19, 2025
Fiscal Note February 19, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 14, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025
Fiscal Note April 14, 2025
Bill April 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2025
Fiscal Note March 26, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 8, 2025
Analysis March 25, 2025