Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1494 Analysis / Analysis

Filed 03/20/2025

                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   S.B. 1494     89R8720 LRM-D   By: Johnson; West         State Affairs         3/20/2025         As Filed          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   In November 2024, Dallas voters approved Proposition D, which amended the city charter to hold elections "according to state law" rather than in May. In order to preserve their nonpartisan nature, the Dallas Charter Review Commission took the additional step of suggesting odd-numbered Novembers, which regularly coincide with state constitutional ballot propositions.   However, Section 41.0052 of the Texas Election Code sets a deadline of December 31, 2016, for the ability of cities that hold their general elections in months other than November to change their general election date to be uniform with state law. May city elections in Dallas have had disparagingly low turnout, averaging single digits during the last six cycles. Holding city elections in November will increase turnout due to the heightened attention on up-ballot elections while maintaining their nonpartisan naturethe elections will be held in odd-numbered Novembers, avoiding the potential influence of highly partisan statewide and federal elections while still receiving the turnout boost by coinciding with state constitutional ballot propositions.   S.B. 1494 amends Section 41.0052 of the Election Code to change the date on which cities with off-cycle elections can alter their election dates to coincide with the state's to December 31, 2026. This will ensure that the city of Dallas is able to change their date in compliance with Proposition D, as well as provide this ability to other cities in the future.   As proposed, S.B. 1494 amends current law relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to change the date of their general elections.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Section 41.0052(a), Election Code, to authorize the governing body of a political subdivision, other than a county or municipal utility district, that holds its general election for officers on a date other than the November uniform election date to, not later than December 31, 2026, rather than December 31, 2016, change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to the November uniform election date.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2025. 

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center S.B. 1494
89R8720 LRM-D By: Johnson; West
 State Affairs
 3/20/2025
 As Filed

Senate Research Center

S.B. 1494

89R8720 LRM-D

By: Johnson; West

 

State Affairs

 

3/20/2025

 

As Filed

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

In November 2024, Dallas voters approved Proposition D, which amended the city charter to hold elections "according to state law" rather than in May. In order to preserve their nonpartisan nature, the Dallas Charter Review Commission took the additional step of suggesting odd-numbered Novembers, which regularly coincide with state constitutional ballot propositions.

 

However, Section 41.0052 of the Texas Election Code sets a deadline of December 31, 2016, for the ability of cities that hold their general elections in months other than November to change their general election date to be uniform with state law. May city elections in Dallas have had disparagingly low turnout, averaging single digits during the last six cycles. Holding city elections in November will increase turnout due to the heightened attention on up-ballot elections while maintaining their nonpartisan naturethe elections will be held in odd-numbered Novembers, avoiding the potential influence of highly partisan statewide and federal elections while still receiving the turnout boost by coinciding with state constitutional ballot propositions.

 

S.B. 1494 amends Section 41.0052 of the Election Code to change the date on which cities with off-cycle elections can alter their election dates to coincide with the state's to December 31, 2026. This will ensure that the city of Dallas is able to change their date in compliance with Proposition D, as well as provide this ability to other cities in the future.

 

As proposed, S.B. 1494 amends current law relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to change the date of their general elections.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Section 41.0052(a), Election Code, to authorize the governing body of a political subdivision, other than a county or municipal utility district, that holds its general election for officers on a date other than the November uniform election date to, not later than December 31, 2026, rather than December 31, 2016, change the date on which it holds its general election for officers to the November uniform election date.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2025.