2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2025; March 6, 2025, |
---|
| 3 | + | read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; |
---|
| 4 | + | March 31, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 10, |
---|
| 5 | + | Nays 0; March 31, 2025, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 7 | | |
---|
5 | 8 | | |
---|
6 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
7 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
8 | 11 | | relating to the authority of certain political subdivisions to |
---|
9 | 12 | | change the date of their general elections. |
---|
10 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 41.0052(a), Election Code, is amended to |
---|
12 | 15 | | read as follows: |
---|
13 | 16 | | (a) The governing body of a political subdivision, other |
---|
14 | 17 | | than a county or municipal utility district, that holds its general |
---|
15 | 18 | | election for officers on a date other than the November uniform |
---|
16 | 19 | | election date may, not later than December 31, 2026 [2016], change |
---|
17 | 20 | | the date on which it holds its general election for officers to the |
---|
18 | 21 | | November uniform election date. |
---|
19 | 22 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
20 | 23 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
21 | 24 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
22 | 25 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
23 | 26 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|