House | 05/05/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2839 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2839 | |
House | 05/05/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3609 | Journal Page: 2839 |
House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2024 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2034 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1823 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1412 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1412 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Blanco | Journal Page: 1411 |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1411 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1411 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1308 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 454 | |
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 454 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |