House | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1646 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1646 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hughes | Journal Page: 828 |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 828 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |