Senate | 04/30/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 456 | |
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 456 | |
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |