House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1378 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1097 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |