Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1660 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2025
Analysis February 26, 2025
Fiscal Note February 26, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List May 5, 2025
Analysis May 5, 2025
Fiscal Note May 5, 2025
Bill May 5, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 1, 2025
Fiscal Note April 29, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2025
Analysis April 25, 2025