Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1662 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/07/2025

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1662
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2025; March 11, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture and
 Rural Affairs; April 7, 2025, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 7, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice provided to certain public drinking water supply
 systems before water quality testing.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 341, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 341.0317 to read as follows:
 Sec. 341.0317.  NOTICE OF WATER QUALITY TESTING. The
 commission may provide notice not more than 24 hours in advance to a
 public drinking water supply system that obtains its water supply
 from underground sources of the commission's intent to perform
 water quality testing to investigate a complaint related to the
 public drinking water supply system's water quality.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *