Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1681 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/28/2025

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1681
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2025; March 11, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 28, 2025, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 28, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an annual boarding home facility report for certain
 counties and municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 260, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Section 260.0105 to read as follows:
 Sec. 260.0105.  COUNTY AND MUNICIPALITY REPORTING
 REQUIREMENTS. (a) Not later than September 30 of each year, each
 county or municipality that regulates boarding home facilities,
 including a county or municipality that requires a person to obtain
 a permit to operate a boarding home facility as authorized by
 Section 260.004, shall submit to the commission in the form and
 manner the commission requires a written report that includes:
 (1)  the county's or municipality's standards or
 ordinances applicable to boarding home facilities in effect on the
 date the report is submitted;
 (2)  any policies or procedures the county or
 municipality requires to consider a resident's or prospective
 resident's reasonable accommodation request;
 (3)  during the preceding year, the total number of:
 (A)  reasonable accommodation requests received,
 approved, and rejected, including the reason a request was
 rejected;
 (B)  complaints or actions brought against a
 boarding home facility located in the county or municipality
 related to a violation of federal or state fair housing laws; and
 (C)  boarding home facility closures, including
 the reason a facility closed and the accommodations provided to the
 facility's former residents;
 (4)  information on any activities the county or
 municipality performs to support the operators of boarding home
 facilities in complying with applicable regulations; and
 (5)  a summary of complaints the county or municipality
 receives against boarding home facilities located in the county or
 municipality.
 (b)  Each county or municipality shall report to the
 commission any updates made to the standards or ordinances
 described by Subsection (a)(1) after the report is submitted under
 that subsection. A county or municipality shall report the updates
 in the form and manner the commission requires.
 (c)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary
 to implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  Notwithstanding Section 260.0105, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act, a county or municipality is not
 required to submit a report required by that section until
 September 30, 2026.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *