Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1681 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1681
2+ (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2025; March 11, 2025,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
4+ Services; April 28, 2025, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 28, 2025, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49
510
611 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
712 AN ACT
813 relating to an annual boarding home facility report for certain
914 counties and municipalities.
1015 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1116 SECTION 1. Chapter 260, Health and Safety Code, is amended
1217 by adding Section 260.0105 to read as follows:
1318 Sec. 260.0105. COUNTY AND MUNICIPALITY REPORTING
1419 REQUIREMENTS. (a) Not later than September 30 of each year, each
1520 county or municipality that regulates boarding home facilities,
1621 including a county or municipality that requires a person to obtain
1722 a permit to operate a boarding home facility as authorized by
1823 Section 260.004, shall submit to the commission in the form and
1924 manner the commission requires a written report that includes:
2025 (1) the county's or municipality's standards or
2126 ordinances applicable to boarding home facilities in effect on the
2227 date the report is submitted;
2328 (2) any policies or procedures the county or
2429 municipality requires to consider a resident's or prospective
2530 resident's reasonable accommodation request;
2631 (3) during the preceding year, the total number of:
2732 (A) reasonable accommodation requests received,
2833 approved, and rejected, including the reason a request was
2934 rejected;
3035 (B) complaints or actions brought against a
3136 boarding home facility located in the county or municipality
3237 related to a violation of federal or state fair housing laws; and
3338 (C) boarding home facility closures, including
3439 the reason a facility closed and the accommodations provided to the
3540 facility's former residents;
3641 (4) information on any activities the county or
3742 municipality performs to support the operators of boarding home
3843 facilities in complying with applicable regulations; and
3944 (5) a summary of complaints the county or municipality
4045 receives against boarding home facilities located in the county or
4146 municipality.
4247 (b) Each county or municipality shall report to the
4348 commission any updates made to the standards or ordinances
4449 described by Subsection (a)(1) after the report is submitted under
4550 that subsection. A county or municipality shall report the updates
4651 in the form and manner the commission requires.
4752 (c) The executive commissioner may adopt rules as necessary
4853 to implement this section.
4954 SECTION 2. Notwithstanding Section 260.0105, Health and
5055 Safety Code, as added by this Act, a county or municipality is not
5156 required to submit a report required by that section until
5257 September 30, 2026.
5358 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
59+ * * * * *