Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Mar 25 2025 3:26PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/29/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Insurance: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Insurance: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Administration
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Corrections: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Human Services: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/01/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 03/11/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce