Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1697 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2025
Analysis February 28, 2025
Fiscal Note February 28, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 17, 2025
Bill April 17, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 31, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 26, 2025
Bill March 26, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2025
Analysis March 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2025
Bill March 26, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 17, 2025