Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1721 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2025
Analysis February 28, 2025
Fiscal Note February 28, 2025
Bill February 27, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Analysis April 16, 2025
Witness List April 16, 2025
Fiscal Note April 16, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 16, 2025
Fiscal Note March 16, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2025
Analysis March 14, 2025