Senate | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1503 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 528 | |
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |