House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1344 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote RV#1344 | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2513 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1156 | Journal Page: 2512 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2512 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2512 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2954 | Journal Page: 2512 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2030 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1858 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1262 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 529 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 481 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |