Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1746 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/14/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton, Hagenbuch S.B. No. 1746
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2025; March 13, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 14, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 14, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1746 By:  Hagenbuch




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the relocation or removal of dredged spoils or
 materials by a navigation district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 60, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 60.1021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 60.1021.  RELOCATION OR REMOVAL OF DREDGED SPOILS OR
 MATERIALS. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Dredged material placement area" means a
 federally authorized disposal site for dredged spoils or materials.
 (2)  "Sole expense" means the actual cost of or an
 in-kind contribution for the relocation or removal after deducting
 the net salvage value derived from the dredged spoils or materials.
 (b)  If, in an exercise of the district's powers under this
 subchapter, the district's power of eminent domain, or the
 district's police power, a district requires the relocation or
 removal of dredged spoils or materials from a dredged material
 placement area owned, operated, managed, or established by another
 district, the district that requires the relocation or removal
 shall:
 (1)  comply with all requirements imposed by the United
 States Army Corp of Engineers related to the dredged material
 placement area; and
 (2)  either:
 (A)  pay at the district's sole expense the cost
 of relocating or removing dredged spoils or materials; or
 (B)  relocate or remove the dredged spoils or
 materials.
 (c)  If the relocation or removal of dredged spoils or
 materials under Subsection (b) results in the reduction of another
 district's rights to capacity in the dredged material placement
 area, the district that required the relocation or removal shall be
 obligated to:
 (1)  replace the affected district's lost capacity and
 provide rights to the replaced lost capacity in an alternative
 dredged material placement area; and
 (2)  pay the affected district's increased costs, if
 any, to transport the dredged spoils or materials associated with
 the lost capacity to the alternative dredged material placement
 area described by Subdivision (1).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *