Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1651
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#369
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Record vote RV#369
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1650
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1598
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2110
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1097
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Paxton
|
Journal Page: 1069
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Referred to Education K-16
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|