House | 05/05/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2035 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2035 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1836 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1438 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 533 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 533 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |