Senate | 04/29/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1503 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 534 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 534 | |
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |